Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Del Vella I, Llc, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time143 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Supplemental | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Supplemental |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.