Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Macpherson, Sosha Lynn, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Petition Of) (Cvpt case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Petition Of) (Cvpt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time95 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof / Affidavit of Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.