Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Durigan, Jason, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) case represented by Trent, David M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) (Vs) (Cvpt) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time45 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Approving Minors Compromise | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Application & Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition For Compromise of Minor's Claim | |
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.