Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Miller, Rayann Lee, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Vega, Midesa, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2014 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time257 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Order $85 | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.