Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2012 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time187 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Notice | |
February 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Hearing
Judge: Smith, Michael R |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Reply Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.