Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management139 days |
Filing DateJune 18, 2010 |
Category(39) Unlimited Other Judicial Review |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
|
Case Cycle Time437 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.