Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Campos, Michelle, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case against Long, Tiffany, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2010 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time69 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
August 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.