Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yang, Jeng, Hang, Mary, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Gisi, Lyle D, against Associated Brokers, Poston, Jim, Dickson, Ann, represented by Lamon, Steven A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management273 days |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2005 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time710 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal & Proof of Service | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
September 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Response | |
June 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
June 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.