Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Maria Garcia, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Brown, Steven L, against Adventist Health And Rideout, Adventist Health, Rideout Memorial Hospital, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
Category(45) Unlimited Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.