Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Navarro, Luis A., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gimblin, Steve, against Mojica, Ignacio M., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management129 days |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2022 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.