Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Johnson, Mary E., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gimblin, Steve, against The Salvation Army, represented by Arevalo, Eric, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateMay 01, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Posted | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.