Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brewer, Jeffery, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Adamson, Christopher B, against Daniels, Debra, Dobyns, Jacob, Nam, Emi, Nam Family Trust, Sds Marysville, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Nematollahi, Arash, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management130 days |
Filing DateApril 09, 2020 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Cross Complaint - No Fee | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Reply Filed | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.