Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Romero, Daniel Ray, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schneiderman, Daniel G, against Bailey Heavy Equipment Hauling, Inc., Ritchson, Cameron David, represented by Jacobsen & Mcelroy Pc, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Party Appeared by Audio and/or Video | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.