Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carter, Darla, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hill, Dennis B, against Marysville Joint Unified School District, represented by Garcia, Lynn A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 02, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
OSC For Failure To Appear
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Electronic | |
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.