Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Welch, Michael, Chavez, Damon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mccrary, Daniel L, against Jackson, Perry, Olivehurst Public Utility District, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.