Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gherle, Cornel, Gherle, Daniela, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hill, Dennis B, against Olesnski, Justin, Rodriguez, Jose Julian, Rodriguez, Jose Luis, represented by Finch, Steven H, Garson, Edward P, Stevens, Daniel A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2017 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial672 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time672 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Tickler | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Application - No Fee | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.