Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hanson, Alice, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Arnold, Barrick, against County Of Lake, Luis, Kevin, represented by Wyatt, James A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial391 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time600 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Partially Electronic File as of this date | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.