Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Larsen, Tyler Jay, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dreyer Babich Buccola Wood Campora, against Mahoney, Zachary Thomas, represented by Debernard, Gregory V, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Jury, Trial presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJury, Trial Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management39 days |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2013 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time536 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Long Cause
Judge: Jury, Trial |
|
May 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motions in Limine Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Conference, Settlement |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Long Cause | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine filed | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.