Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thomas, Roy C, Thomas, Shirley K, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hill, Dennis B, against Gamiz, Rachel, represented by Defelice, Ann Marie, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2010 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time264 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Statement Sent | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Refer to Docket | |
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
May 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Mediator Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.