Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Page, William, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lockhart Park Llp, against Jenson, Robert Geoffrey, Gillette, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2010 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time188 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
April 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.