Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carbone, Tina, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time164 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Delinquent Account | |
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Paid In Full | |
September 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Dec & Ord Reimbursement Conservator/Guardian Investigation | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition - No Fee | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor Person Only
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.