Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Immoos, Jennifer Lynn filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2016 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition to Fix Residence outside the State of California
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition to Fix Residence outside the State of California
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Referral to Kimberly Jablonowski | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.