Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Quetzal filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 10, 2015 |
CategoryGuardianship - Estate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions46 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time1237 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Guardianship | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Termination of Guardianship
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.