Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2014 |
CategoryGuardianship - Estate |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions67 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Investigators Report | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Annual Conservatorship Review Hearing | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.