Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Counsel filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Amended Order | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Petition Filed | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Accounting Report | |
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.