Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Counsel filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Account / Report Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Accounting Report | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Receipt for Transferred Case | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Certified Mail Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.