Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spies, Megan, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time154 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
PR Petition for Appoint. of Conservator of Person and Estate
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
PR Petition for Appoint. of Conservator of Person and Estate
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
PR Petition for Appoint. of Conservator of Person and Estate
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
PR Petition for Appoint. of Conservator of Person and Estate
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.