Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County Public Guardian Conservator, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 23, 2012 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation - Infractions | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.