Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Counsel filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2003 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions40 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time3303 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
December 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Accounting Report | |
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
December 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Letters Issued | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Accounting Report | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review Accounting
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.