Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hampton, Mary filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2002 |
CategoryConservatorship (Prpc) |
Time To Trial92 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions201 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
|
Case Cycle Time3358 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Address Change | |
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
October 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Exhibit Destruction Verification (conversion) | |
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice and Order Disposition of Exhibits CV | |
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Annual Review Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Conservatorship Hearing on Annual Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.