Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wilkins, Courtney Shawn, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions193 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
|
Case Cycle Time193 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Court | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
PR - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.