Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pate, Anthony James filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2018 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time279 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Receipt on Distribution | |
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
PR- Petition for Final Distribution
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PR Order Final Distribution | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | PR Petition for Final Distribution | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.