Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gengler, Courtney E filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Probate Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Review Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | PR Inventory & Appraisal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.