Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Powell, Betty Colleen filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2004 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate (Prpb) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions18 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
|
Case Cycle Time145 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Refer to Docket | |
January 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Order Determining Succession to Real Property | |
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
January 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 23, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Probate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.