Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
California Credit Bureau, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Suhr, John D, against Boardman, Christine, Boardman, Wade E, represented by Waggoman & Smith, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Conversion Error, . presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion Error, . Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 1997 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Historical Case - Ignore JBSIS Errors | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Renewal of Judgment | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
August 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: O'Connor, Kathleen R |
|
July 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.