Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hoffman, Martin, against House, Cynthia M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment Arrangements Made | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Portal Payment Ready | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer / Response / Denial - Limited $10K to $25K | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.