Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fast Choice Markets, Llc, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Chima, Rajdep S, against Arnold , Heather, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2020 |
Category(39) Limited Other Judicial Review - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Time To Trial263 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Trial
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal - Amended Appeal Filed | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal - From Labor Commissioner's Award | |
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.