Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rocky Top Rentals, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark, Jeffrey A, against Watson, Kristina L, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateMay 13, 2020 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Order for Publication | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Publication or Posting | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.