Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Mahfouz, Richard L, Ii, against Knacke, Jaime Suzanne, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
Category(18) Limited Insurance Coverage - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time538 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Court/Clerk Judgment | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.