Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Usaa General Indemnity Company, A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Wilks, Robert A, against Parker Fultz, Matthew Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2018 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time160 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.