Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lobel Financial Corp., A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Huang, Shiao-Wen, against Kocialkoski, Dorothy A., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management531 days |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2018 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time531 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.