Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tang, Jason W, against Somera, Arielyn I, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions252 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time252 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment by Clerk | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.