Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Msw Capital Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Brodbeck, Lori, against Huerta, Henry, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management539 days |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time665 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.