Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Peterson, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Arendt, Ronald A, against Oregel, Soledad, Oregel, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management116 days |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2017 |
Category(22) Limited Auto - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time214 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.