Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fox, Jenny, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Friedman, Todd M, against Solloway, Robert, Ufs Debt Recovery, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2017 |
Category(35) Limited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time291 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
November 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.