Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rash Curtis & Associates, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Oliveira, Duane S, against Trimble, Krista L, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time488 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Partially Electronic File as of this date | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.