Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sunlan Ldp Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kenosian & Miele, against Vance, Heather A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: McBride, Kim E |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.