Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kbr Inc, Rash Curtis & Associates, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Oliveira, Duane S, against Hulsey, Christine, Hulsey, William W, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2011 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions116 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
April 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.