Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nguyen, Soy, Tranh, The, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Wander, Geoffrey B, against Sherlund, Teresa, represented by Cameron Cobden, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2011 |
Category(22) Limited Auto - 10,000 To 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1145 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Dismiss With Prejudice | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.