Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ellis Lake Condominium Apartments, filed a(n) (42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 case represented by Bloxham, Thomas L, against Jones, Clarencine, represented by Party Defaulted, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2010 |
Category(42) Limited Other Complaint (Not Spec) - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions240 days |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time240 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
August 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.